This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/16/2023 at 02:43:45 (UTC).

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P VS MANUEL, ANDRES Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2023 WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MANUEL, ANDRES. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE and MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P

Defendants

MANUEL, JESSICA

MANUEL, ANDRES

ORTIZ, IVETTE

MANUEL, JOHANNA

Not Classified By Court

WILDWOOD PRESERVE APARTMENT HO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, BARRY B

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON AUGUST 14 2023 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON AUGUST 16 2023

08/18/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON AUGUST 14 2023 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON AUGUST 16 2023

WRIT OF POSSESSION

08/10/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION

PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

08/09/2023:PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

08/07/2023:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/31/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JESSICA MANUEL ANDRES MANUEL JOHANNA MANUEL AND IVETTE ORTIZ

07/26/2023:DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JESSICA MANUEL ANDRES MANUEL JOHANNA MANUEL AND IVETTE ORTIZ

PROPOSED DEFAULT

07/25/2023:PROPOSED DEFAULT

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST JESSICA MANUEL ANDRES MANUEL JOHANNA MANUEL AND IVETTE ORTIZ

07/25/2023:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST JESSICA MANUEL ANDRES MANUEL JOHANNA MANUEL AND IVETTE ORTIZ

RETURN OF SERVCE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR JOHANNA MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

07/19/2023:RETURN OF SERVCE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR JOHANNA MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR JESSICA MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

07/19/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR JESSICA MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

RETURN OF SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

07/19/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR ANDRES MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

07/19/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR ANDRES MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO IVETTE ORTIZ

07/14/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO IVETTE ORTIZ

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO JOHANNA MANUEL

07/13/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO JOHANNA MANUEL

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO JESSICA MANUEL

07/13/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO JESSICA MANUEL

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANDRES MANUEL

07/13/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANDRES MANUEL

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

07/12/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

07/12/2023:REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON AUGUST 14 2023 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON AUGUST 16 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JESSICA MANUEL ANDRES MANUEL JOHANNA MANUEL AND IVETTE ORTIZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST JESSICA MANUEL ANDRES MANUEL JOHANNA MANUEL AND IVETTE ORTIZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVCE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO IVETTE ORTIZ FOR JOHANNA MANUEL SERVED ON JULY 17 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
07/13/2023

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $225.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $225.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCase 602023CC000734CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less