Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/05/2019 at 03:31:28 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC VS ADAMS, JOHN

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADAMS, JOHN. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and PAUL MILITELLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

ADAMS, JOHN

Not Classified By Court

ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketLETTER FOR RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON JOHN ADAMS MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE ON JOHN ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL scheduled on 1/13/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 442069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCase 602019SC000829SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/13/2020 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MX Courtroom C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASCADE CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C