Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 05:38:59 (UTC).

CARNES, BONITA I, CARNES, DUWAYNE D Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 CARNES, BONITA I, CARNES, DUWAYNE D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARNES, BONITA I

Decedent

CARNES, DUWAYNE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PITTMAN, AMY REED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket*ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE OF TRUST BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 475434

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 602021CP000185CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITTMAN, AMY REED