This case was last updated from Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/15/2022 at 03:07:31 (UTC).

CALHOUN, CATHERINE Et Al VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 CALHOUN, CATHERINE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALHOUN, WILLIAM

CALHOUN, CATHERINE

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNHILL, DAVID DUFF

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN, BRIAN TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/23/2022:COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ATTORNEY BRIAN T ALLEN ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 510883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF WILLIAM CALHOUNS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS WILLIAM CALHOUNS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CA000255CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLEN , BRIAN TAYLOR