Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/21/2019 at 03:33:36 (UTC).

BUZZELLI, MARCO Et Al VS CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING L

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 BUZZELLI, MARCO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING L. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and PAUL MILITELLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUZZELLI, MARCO

ROMEO, FRAN

Defendant

CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD R STEVENS REGISTERED AGENT MEMBER FOR CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $17.00 Receipt Number M 444781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $17.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL scheduled on 2/10/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE ON CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE ON RICHARD R STEVENS REGISTERED AGENT MEMBER CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLEAN GREEN PRESSURE WASHING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL scheduled on 1/13/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $317.00 Receipt Number M 443437

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase 602019SC000865SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/10/2020 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Courtr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/13/2020 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Courtr

    Read MoreRead Less