Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:59:52 (UTC).

BROWN, LOUIS J VS ANY UNKNOWN TENANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 BROWN, LOUIS J filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN TENANT. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, LOUIS J

Defendants

GIBBS, RAJEAN

ANY UNKNOWN TENANT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF EVICTION SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT MAILED TO REJEAN GIBBS AND ANY UNKNOWN TENANT RETURNED UNDELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO ANY UNKNOWN TENANT NKA ALICIA SLOAN SERVED ON 12/02/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO RAJEAN GIBBS SERVED ON 12/02/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO RAJEAN GIBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 443537

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CC000867CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less