Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/12/2019 at 01:32:16 (UTC).

BRAND, VICTORIA VS MOORE, DANIEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 BRAND, VICTORIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MOORE, DANIEL. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAND, VICTORIA

Defendants

MOORE, DANIEL

MOORE, SHANNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT-EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST SHANNON MOORE AND DANIEL MOORE/DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF EVICTION SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT MAILED TO SHANNON MOORE AND DANIEL MOORE RETURNED UNDELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO SHANNON MOORE SERVED ON 11/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO DANIEL LE MOORE SERVED ON 11/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO DANIEL MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO SHANNON MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 442582

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CC000845CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less