Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 05:35:54 (UTC).

BOGLE, SEAN, DEBLOIS, GEORGE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 BOGLE, SEAN, DEBLOIS, GEORGE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

BOGLE, SEAN

Decedent

DEBLOIS, GEORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 475443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIVIL ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 602021CP000186CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less