This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 11/24/2021 at 08:22:09 (UTC).

BOBROWSKI, CLAMOUNTE ROBERT, CLATTERBUCK, DENISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 BOBROWSKI, CLAMOUNTE ROBERT, CLATTERBUCK, DENISE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Decedent

BOBROWSKI, CLAMOUNTE ROBERT

Not Classified By Court

CLATTERBUCK, DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WOLGAMOTT, JENNIFER ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $3.00 Receipt Number M 495040

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT TO SELL REAL PROPERTY SIGN BY MICHELE BOBROWSKI BELKNAP AND CONSENT TO SELL REAL PROPERTY SIGN BY EDWARD BOBROWSKI AND CONSENT TO SELL PROPERTY SIGN BY JAMES FRASER AND CONSENT TO SELL PROPERTY SIGN BY JESSICVA ANDRAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO SELL REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY BY GEORGE W SHANKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND BY MICHELE BOBROWSKI BELKNAP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND EDWARD BOBROWSKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND BY JAMES FRASER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND BY GEORGE W SHANKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 484251

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase 602021CP000491CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLGAMOTT, JENNIFER ANN