This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 11/10/2019 at 04:31:22 (UTC).

BIRCH, MICHAEL ROBERT VS FORYS-BIRCH, LESLIE ANN

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 BIRCH, MICHAEL ROBERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FORYS-BIRCH, LESLIE ANN. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORLEY, MICHELLE T and BARBARA KISSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

BARBARA KISSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BIRCH, MICHAEL ROBERT

Respondent

FORYS-BIRCH, LESLIE ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 11/21/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge BARBARA KISSNER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE FOR FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR LESLIE ANN FORYS-BIRCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR MICHAEL ROBERT BIRCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR LESLIE ANN FORYS-BIRCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR MICHAEL ROBERT BIRCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Payment received: $397.50 Receipt Number M 441391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case 602019DR000630DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less