This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:29:35 (UTC).

BELL, MARIE KATHRYN, DUNCAN, THERESA B Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 BELL, MARIE KATHRYN, DUNCAN, THERESA B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Claimant

MARION COUNTY FIRE RESCUE

Not Classified By Court

DUNCAN, THERESA B

Decedent

BELL, MARIE KATHRYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

RICHARD, JAMES LEONARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM BY MARION COUNTY FRIE RESCUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY AND PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY BY ELIZABETH MARIE SPLENDORIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY AND PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY BY PATRICIA MARIE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY AND PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 449819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF RIGHT TO ACT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY PATRICIA MARIES JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CP000101CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD, JAMES LEONARD