Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/14/2019 at 05:30:47 (UTC).

BEDGOOD, JOEL JR, BEDGOOD, RANDY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 BEDGOOD, JOEL JR, BEDGOOD, RANDY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

BEDGOOD, RANDY

Decedent

BEDGOOD, JOEL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LEEPER, ANDREW JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 442952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND -TERRY BEDGOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND -SHELLEY ABNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND DWAYNE BEDGOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CP000833CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEEPER ANDREW J