This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 12/21/2019 at 03:01:28 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS BRENNER, MICHAEL J

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRENNER, MICHAEL J. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HATCHER, MARY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HATCHER, MARY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

BRENNER, MICHAEL J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON MICHAEL J BRENNER SERVED ON 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHAEL J BRENNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 443512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CA000470CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less