Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/17/2019 at 05:30:31 (UTC).

AVERY, DORIS C, MARCHAND, DOROTHY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2019 AVERY, DORIS C, MARCHAND, DOROTHY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Decedent

AVERY, DORIS C

Not Classified By Court

MARCHAND, DOROTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY STEPHEN PICCOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY CAROLINE CIRACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY ELIZABETH PANAGOULIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 443143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT &

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CP000844CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less