This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 15:38:38 (UTC).

ATKINSON, IRIS A, ATKINSON, IRIS ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 ATKINSON, IRIS A, ATKINSON, IRIS ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEAVERLING, GARY DEAN

Decedent

ATKINSON, IRIS A

Not Classified By Court

ATKINSON, IRIS ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFIED COPIES TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket*ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT BY GARY DEAN WEAVERLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $245.00 Receipt Number M 455644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $245.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CP000311CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less