This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 09/13/2020 at 03:05:40 (UTC).

ARNOTT, MELANIE Et Al VS BRIANS ELECTRIC INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 ARNOTT, MELANIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIANS ELECTRIC INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF and HATCHER, MARY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

HATCHER, MARY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF GEORGE STEWART

ARNOTT, MELANIE

Defendants

MOSES, JAMES HENRY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPOR

BRIANS ELECTRIC INC

CITY OF WILDWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POSGAY, MATTHEW NICHOLS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION KEVIN J THIBAULT SECRETARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES JIMMY PATRONIS CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number M 461916

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF WILDWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMES HENRY MOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BRIANS ELECTRI C INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT BRIANS ELECTRIC INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CA000394CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF WILDWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Posgay, Matthew Nichols