This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:07:03 (UTC).

ALDRICH, JAMIE KAY VS WAINNER, ROBERT JAMES

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 ALDRICH, JAMIE KAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WAINNER, ROBERT JAMES. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALDRICH, JAMIE KAY

Respondent

WAINNER, ROBERT JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FISHER, JODY LYNN

Respondent Attorney

PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CO-APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY NAYLOR ON BEHALF OF ROBERT WAINNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketHUSBANDS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MADATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING HUSBANDS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $295.00 Receipt Number M 454412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $295.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketWIFES ANSWER TO HUSBANDS COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COPY OF FLORIDA DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE/SERVING OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION OF DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase 602020DR000115DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD