This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 13:58:24 (UTC).

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION VS ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLIED COOLING HEATING LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCHUGH, ANDREA, WALKER, STEPHEN, RUHL, MARIA and CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCHUGH, ANDREA

WALKER, STEPHEN

RUHL, MARIA

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

Defendant

ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REINER, SAMUEL BARCLAY II

Defendant Attorney

GENSON, MELODY DERINGTON

 

Court Documents

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

12/18/2020: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - TROY THOMAS

12/18/2020: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - TROY THOMAS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND REQUEST NOTICES

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND REQUEST NOTICES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/4/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/4/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE - TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

6/19/2020: RESPONSE - TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

MOTION - TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS

6/16/2020: MOTION - TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2020063355)

5/14/2020: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2020063355)

AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM

3/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM

DEFAULT - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

1/29/2020: DEFAULT - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

1/28/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - ALLIED COLLING & HEATING LLC.

1/9/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - ALLIED COLLING & HEATING LLC.

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019123629

12/12/2019: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019123629

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC- ISSUED 12/12/2019

12/12/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC- ISSUED 12/12/2019

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019123247

12/11/2019: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019123247

COMPLAINT

12/11/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - TROY THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND REQUEST NOTICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2020063355)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ALLIED COLLING & HEATING LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019123629

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALLIED COOLING & HEATING LLC- ISSUED 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019123247

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YORK OPERATING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REINER, SAMUEL BARCLAY II