This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:22:53 (UTC).

WOLSTEIN CHIROPRACTIC & SPORTS INJURY CENTER LLC VS MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 WOLSTEIN CHIROPRACTIC SPORTS INJURY CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOLSTEIN CHIROPRACTIC & SPORTS INJURY CENTER LLC

Defendant

MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN, DEREK

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/28/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

11/14/2017: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC FROM JANE WESSELMAN CPM TO KAREN E RUSHING

11/13/2017: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC FROM JANE WESSELMAN CPM TO KAREN E RUSHING

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

11/1/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/1/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

10/4/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017089790

9/22/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017089790

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

9/22/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

9/22/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/22/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/22/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

9/22/2017: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

9/22/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC FROM JANE WESSELMAN CPM TO KAREN E RUSHING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 11/28/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017089790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 10/31/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less