Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 05/14/2021 at 18:07:40 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPCITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2014 2 VS CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPCITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2014 2 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPCITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2014 2

Defendants

DOVE INVESTMENT CORP

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

PAVLENKO, LIDIA

PAVLENKO, YURY

SHULGINA, VALENTYNA

PAVLENKO, YURY M

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CHASE BANK USA NA

PAVLENKO, LIDIA I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, ANNA

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/10/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

5/10/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED - CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

4/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

SUMMONS SERVED - DOVE INVESTMENT CORP

4/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - DOVE INVESTMENT CORP

SUMMONS SERVED - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CHASE BANK USA NA

4/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CHASE BANK USA NA

SUMMONS SERVED - VALENTYNA SHULGINA

4/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - VALENTYNA SHULGINA

SUMMONS SERVED - YURY PAVLENKO AKA YURY M PAVLENKO

4/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - YURY PAVLENKO AKA YURY M PAVLENKO

SUMMONS SERVED - CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

4/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

4/23/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC- ISSUED 03/15/2021.

3/12/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC- ISSUED 03/15/2021.

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA- ISSUED 03/15/2021

3/12/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA- ISSUED 03/15/2021

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- VALENTYNA SHULGINA- ISSUED 03/15/2021

3/12/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- VALENTYNA SHULGINA- ISSUED 03/15/2021

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LIDIA PAVLENKO AKA LIDIA I PAVLENKO- ISSUED 03/15/2021

3/12/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LIDIA PAVLENKO AKA LIDIA I PAVLENKO- ISSUED 03/15/2021

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- YURY PAVLENKO AKA YURY M PAVLENKO- ISSUED 03/15/2021

3/12/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- YURY PAVLENKO AKA YURY M PAVLENKO- ISSUED 03/15/2021

NOTICE- VALUE

3/12/2021: NOTICE- VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021044597)

3/12/2021: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021044597)

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

3/12/2021: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DOVE INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CHASE BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - VALENTYNA SHULGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - YURY PAVLENKO AKA YURY M PAVLENKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DOVE INVESTMENT CORP- ISSUED 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC- ISSUED 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA- ISSUED 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- VALENTYNA SHULGINA- ISSUED 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LIDIA PAVLENKO AKA LIDIA I PAVLENKO- ISSUED 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- YURY PAVLENKO AKA YURY M PAVLENKO- ISSUED 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021044597)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOVE INVESTMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant