Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 04/30/2021 at 18:03:05 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE OF CSMC 2019RPL5 TRUST VS ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE OF CSMC 2019RPL5 TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE OF CSMC 2019RPL5 TRUST

Defendants

JOHNSON, CHARLES

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES R JOHNSON

SCHOENITH, JAY

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY

OLIVER, JASMINE

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

IBERIABANK

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

JOHNSON, CHARLES R

SCHOENITH, JAY M

OLIVER, JASMINE RENEE

CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

BOSSARD, SCOTT THOMAS

SHAMSEY, JOHN

 

Court Documents

MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ATTACHED)

4/19/2021: MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ATTACHED)

SUMMONS NON SERVED - CHARLES R JOHNSON A/K/A CHARLES JOHNSON

4/12/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - CHARLES R JOHNSON A/K/A CHARLES JOHNSON

ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE - CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY

4/1/2021: ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE - CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY

NOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

3/31/2021: NOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER - CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA

3/31/2021: ANSWER - CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES R JOHNSON A/K/A CHARLES JOHNSON

3/31/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES R JOHNSON A/K/A CHARLES JOHNSON

SUMMONS NON SERVED - JAY M. SCHOENITH A/K/A JAY SCHOENITH

3/31/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - JAY M. SCHOENITH A/K/A JAY SCHOENITH

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

3/31/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

3/31/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/1/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/1/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CHARLES R JOHNSOM AKA CHARLES JOHNSON - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/1/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CHARLES R JOHNSOM AKA CHARLES JOHNSON - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/1/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC - ISSUED 03/02/2021

NOTICE- VALUE

3/1/2021: NOTICE- VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

3/1/2021: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

CERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION

3/1/2021: CERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION

COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - CHARLES R JOHNSON A/K/A CHARLES JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE - CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES R JOHNSON A/K/A CHARLES JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - JAY M. SCHOENITH A/K/A JAY SCHOENITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - IBERIABANK

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- IBERIABANK - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CLERK OF COURT FOR SARASOTA COUNTY - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CHARLES R JOHNSOM AKA CHARLES JOHNSON - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE OF CSMC 2019RPL5 TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where IBERIABANK is a litigant