This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2022 at 01:04:00 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF WV 2017 I GRANTOR TRUST VS DIRENZO, LOUISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF WV 2017 I GRANTOR TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DIRENZO, LOUISE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCHUGH, ANDREA and BRUNING, KEVIN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCHUGH, ANDREA

BRUNING, KEVIN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF WV 2017 I GRANTOR TRUST

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGENNS LEINORS TRUSTEES AND ANY OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAISNT VINCENT A CACCESE DECEASED

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VINCENT A CACCESE

DIRENZO, LOUISE

SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETRINO, BRADFORD

Defendant Attorney

HAWK, MARY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022123664)

7/25/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022123664)

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

7/18/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

ANSWER - SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

7/18/2022: ANSWER - SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

6/23/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LOUISE DIRENZO

6/23/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LOUISE DIRENZO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #!

7/18/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #!

SUMMONS SERVED - SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

7/18/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

7/1/2022: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022123664)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #!

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VINCENT A CACCESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LOUISE DIRENZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/18/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #2022056240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - ISSUED 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 1 - ISSUED 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LOUISE DIRENZO - ISSUED 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VINCENT A CACCESE - ISSUED 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022106426)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF WV 2017-1 GRANTOR TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where SARASOTA VILLAGE GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant