This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/23/2022 at 18:34:33 (UTC).

WILHELM JR, BARRY ALBERT Et Al VS SNF PROPERTY LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 WILHELM JR, BARRY ALBERT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SNF PROPERTY LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUNING, KEVIN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRUNING, KEVIN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILHELM JR, BARRY ALBERT

WILHELM, SHANNON RENEE

Defendants

SNF PROPERTY LLC

SUN SIESTA BAY LLC

SUN OUTDOORS SARASOTA

SUN COMMUNITIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARTES, PETER

 

Court Documents

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/6/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022107164

12/5/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022107164

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

12/2/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022106044

12/1/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022106044

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

11/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

11/30/2022: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022105070

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022105070

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 03/21/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022107164

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUN SIESTA BAY LLC DBA SUN OUTDOORS SARASOTA - ISSUED 12/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022106044

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - NAME DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE - SUN SIESTA BAY LLC DBA NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $450.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $2.50; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $7.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE SUN SIESTA BAY LLC DBA SUN OUTDOORS SARASOTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SUN COMMUNITIES INC - ISSUED 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SNF PROPERTY LLC - ISSUED 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sun Outdoors Sarasota is a litigant

Latest cases where SUN COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETER A SARTES, ESQ