This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 22:07:17 (UTC).

WHICHEL, HEIDI VS OLMSTED, MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 WHICHEL, HEIDI filed an Other lawsuit against OLMSTED, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHICHEL, HEIDI

Defendants

OLMSTED, MICHAEL

SUNBELT ELECTRIC INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALTER, BRAD

Defendant Attorney

SCHOLL, HOWARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- VOLUNTARY

6/25/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- VOLUNTARY

NOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

4/29/2019: NOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

REQUEST - COPIES VIA EMAIL

4/3/2019: REQUEST - COPIES VIA EMAIL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

2/15/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

2/14/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

1/18/2019: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/2/2018: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

4/5/2018: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/19/2018: RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/29/2017: NOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/29/2017: NOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/29/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/29/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/29/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/29/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/29/2017: COMPLAINT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- VOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - COPIES VIA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SUNBELT ELECTRIC INC- ISSUED 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less