This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 04:21:39 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES O

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES O. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MONHOLLON, INGRID

INGRID J. MONHOLLON A/K/A INGRID MONHOLLON

BENEFICIAL FLORIDA INC

LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

GROVE POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

MICHAEL E. MONHOLLON A/K/A MICHAEL MONHOLLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UGARTE, LUCIANA

Defendant Attorneys

ROWE, MICHELLE

GUARDADO, ASTRID

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE - CHECKLIST (JUDGMENT)

9/5/2018: FORECLOSURE - CHECKLIST (JUDGMENT)

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

8/29/2018: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF (SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC)

8/27/2018: ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF (SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC)

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

6/11/2018: MOTION - SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

1/23/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

7/25/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS SERVED - LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

7/20/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

PAYMENT $975.00 RECEIPT #2017065440

7/7/2017: PAYMENT $975.00 RECEIPT #2017065440

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-INGRID J MONHOLLON AKA INGRID MONHOLLON - ISSUED 07/11/2017

7/6/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-INGRID J MONHOLLON AKA INGRID MONHOLLON - ISSUED 07/11/2017

MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION. DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

10/29/2018: MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION. DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

10/5/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/20/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

JUDGMENT - FORECLOSURE - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018125369)

9/20/2018: JUDGMENT - FORECLOSURE - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018125369)

RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

8/8/2018: RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

8/17/2017: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL E MONHOLLON AKA MICHAEL MONHOLLON

7/20/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL E MONHOLLON AKA MICHAEL MONHOLLON

NOTICE OF FILING-CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF FILING-CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM SHAPIRO FISHMAN & GACHE LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSING ACTION - DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS - VACATING JUDGMENT - DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018146300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS ACTION. DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CANCELLING SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CANCEL SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED FOR 10/23/2018 PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE CORRESPONDENCE CANCEL SALE 10/23/2018 PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 - ISSUED 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-INGRID J MONHOLLON AKA INGRID MONHOLLON - ISSUED 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-MICHAEL E MONHOLLAN AKA MICHAEL MONHOLLON - ISSUED 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING-CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017085134)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less