Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/03/2021 at 18:32:49 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS WAGNER, JAMES

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAGNER, JAMES. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOEHM, MARYANN and BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOEHM, MARYANN

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

WAGNER, JAMES

Sarasota, FL 34236-6770

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NADERPOUR, AMIR

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - JAMES WAGNER

4/29/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - JAMES WAGNER

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

4/8/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021031053

4/9/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021031053

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/8/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

4/8/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JAMES WAGNER

4/8/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JAMES WAGNER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/8/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JAMES WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021031053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JAMES WAGNER - ISSUED 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR