This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/26/2021 at 17:34:17 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS TONER, RAYMOND L

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TONER, RAYMOND L. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON and DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

TONER, RAYMOND L

North Port, FL 34287-1231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NADERPOUR, AMIR

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - RAYMOND L TONER

9/16/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - RAYMOND L TONER

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

9/13/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

9/13/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021078235

9/13/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021078235

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/13/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

9/13/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - RAYMOND L TONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 10/20/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021078235

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR