This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/14/2021 at 20:13:37 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS PRICE, BLAINE E

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRICE, BLAINE E. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOSS, DANA and QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOSS, DANA

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

PRICE, BLAINE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX, JODI

Defendant Attorney

MILLER VEAL, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/13/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/5/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

9/25/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT - OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

9/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT - OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/25/2019: MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/5/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

8/19/2018: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

REPLY - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/11/2018: REPLY - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

4/13/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

ORDER - TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

11/13/2019: ORDER - TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

AFFIDAVIT - OF AMOUNT DUE

9/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT - OF AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

9/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

ORDER - TO WITHDRAW

9/5/2018: ORDER - TO WITHDRAW

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

6/21/2018: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018038782

4/13/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018038782

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BLAINE E PRICE- ISSUED 4/13/2018

4/13/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BLAINE E PRICE- ISSUED 4/13/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY - FOR DAMAGES AND OR AN ACTION TO COLLECT A DEBT

4/13/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY - FOR DAMAGES AND OR AN ACTION TO COLLECT A DEBT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/13/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - NON SERVED - SARASOTA FLOORING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT - SARASOTA FLOORING SOLUTIONS INC - FORWARDED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020069499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND CURRENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • HearingTime:01:45 PM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019156496)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BLAINE E PRICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018038782

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BLAINE E PRICE- ISSUED 4/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY - FOR DAMAGES AND OR AN ACTION TO COLLECT A DEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less