This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 13:47:21 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS PEMBERTON, SUSAN K

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PEMBERTON, SUSAN K. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

PEMBERTON, SUSAN K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX, JODI

 

Court Documents

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

4/2/2019: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

4/2/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

DEFAULT - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

1/17/2019: DEFAULT - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

1/16/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

SUMMONS SERVED - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

12/24/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

12/17/2018: NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUSAN K PEMBERTON - ISSUED 12/18/2018

12/17/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUSAN K PEMBERTON - ISSUED 12/18/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

12/17/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

8/1/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

AFFIDAVIT - OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

4/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT - OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

NOTICE OF FILING

4/11/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

4/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY STATUS

4/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY STATUS

AFFIDAVIT

4/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEYS' FEES

4/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEYS' FEES

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

1/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018125861

12/18/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018125861

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SUSAN K PEMBERTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018125861

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUSAN K PEMBERTON - ISSUED 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less