This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 18:05:26 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS NIETO, LINA R

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NIETO, LINA R. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

NIETO, LINA R

Sarasota, FL 34233-5029

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON, ADAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

11/23/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

11/23/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/23/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021101353

12/1/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021101353

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LINA R NIETO

12/7/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LINA R NIETO

SUMMONS SERVED - LINA R NIETO

12/13/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - LINA R NIETO

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/28/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - PRETRIAL

12/28/2021: ORDER - PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingTime:11:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LINA R NIETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LINA R NIETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 12/28/2021 AT 11:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021101353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - LINA R NIETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON, ADAM