This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 00:28:59 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

KAREN LYNN KENNEDY AKA KAREN L KENNEDY AKA KAREN KENNEDY AS NATURAL GUARDIAN OF BETHAN KENNEDY A MINOR

BETHANY KENNEDY A MINOR

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY

KENNEDY, VANESSA NOEL

WELLINGTON CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 IF LIVING AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER THE SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GR

ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

PALMER RANCH MASTER PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES CREDITORS LIENORS AND TRUSTEES OF DOUGLAS WARREN KENNEDY JR AKA DOUGLAS W KENNEDY JR DECEASED AND ALL OTHER PERSONS CLAIMING BY AND THROUGH UNDER AGAISNT THE NAMED DEFENDANTS

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1 IF LIVING AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER THE SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONCILIO, AMY

Defendant Attorneys

KARYO, MAX

ROWE, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

BID SHEET

3/27/2019: BID SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

12/4/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF FILING - 1. ORIGINAL NOTE 2. ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

11/9/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - 1. ORIGINAL NOTE 2. ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY, UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1, AND UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018135398)

10/12/2018: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY, UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1, AND UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018135398)

ACCEPTANCE - OF APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

8/30/2018: ACCEPTANCE - OF APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

8/23/2018: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS SERVED - PALMER RANCH MASTER PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8/10/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - PALMER RANCH MASTER PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS SERVED - VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY

8/10/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WELLINGTON CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CO ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC RA - ISSUED 07/24/2018

7/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WELLINGTON CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CO ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC RA - ISSUED 07/24/2018

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

3/8/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF COST

11/16/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF COST

ANSWER - BETHANY KENNEDY A MINOR

10/12/2018: ANSWER - BETHANY KENNEDY A MINOR

MOTION - APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/11/2018: MOTION - APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

8/10/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY

8/10/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION CO PRESIDENTVICE PRESIDENTCHAIRPERSON - ISSUED 07/24/2018

7/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION CO PRESIDENTVICE PRESIDENTCHAIRPERSON - ISSUED 07/24/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY - ISSUED 07/24/2018

7/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY - ISSUED 07/24/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY - ISSUED 07/24/2018

7/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY - ISSUED 07/24/2018

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019044658)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019034382

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR 3/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019023912

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,000.00 RECEIPT #2019021636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION CO PRESIDENTVICE PRESIDENTCHAIRPERSON - ISSUED 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KAREN LYNN KENNEDY AKA KAREN L KENNEDY AKA KAREN KENNEDY AS NATURAL GUARDIAN OF BETHANY KENNEDY A MINOR - ISSUED 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BETHANY KENNEDY A MINOR - ISSUED 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY - ISSUED 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VANESSA NOEL KENNEDY - ISSUED 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS-RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018098493)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less