This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/23/2022 at 18:01:44 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006 10 VS GALE, LEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006 10 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GALE, LEN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006 10

Defendants

GALE, LEN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAVIESO, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021213051)

11/24/2021: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021213051)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

FORECLOSURE FORM A

11/24/2021: FORECLOSURE FORM A

FORECLOSURE FORM B

11/24/2021: FORECLOSURE FORM B

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LEN GALE

11/24/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LEN GALE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE

11/24/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 1

11/24/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 2

11/24/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 2

COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

11/24/2021: COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

NOTICE- VALUE

11/24/2021: NOTICE- VALUE

PAYMENT $1,945.00 RECEIPT #2021099959

11/24/2021: PAYMENT $1,945.00 RECEIPT #2021099959

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

11/29/2021: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE

1/11/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

1/11/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS NON SERVED - LEN GALE

1/11/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - LEN GALE

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

1/11/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7A; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - LEN GALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/22/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7A , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$1,945.00; Amount Paid:$1,945.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,945.00 RECEIPT #2021099959

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - ISSUED - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 1 - ISSUED - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEN GALE - ISSUED - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LEN GALE - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021213051)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER TRAVIESO