Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/07/2021 at 12:20:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WACHOVIA BANK NA A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION VS CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WACHOVIA BANK NA A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WACHOVIA BANK NA A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ROBERTA K WALLRICH AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN P WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST

ROBERTA K WALLRICH AS TRUSTEE OF THE JILL K WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST

CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SABAL TRACE

JILL CUBBA AS SUCCESSOR CO TRUSTEES OF THE LIVING PETER J CUBBA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST UAD

STEPHEN CUBBA AS SUCCESSOR CO TRUSTEES OF THE LIVING PETER J CUBBA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST UAD

CZUBAY, KENNETH

SABAL TRACE GOLF CLUB

WALLRICH, WAYNE T

CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA

CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS INC

SABAL TRACE GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB

SYLVANIA LIGHTING SERVICES CORP

UNKNOWN OWNERS AND TENANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLACHLAN, NIALL TORRANCE

Defendant Attorneys

MORIARTY-SCHLICK, MARK C

SLAYTON, AMBER

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017131148)

10/23/2017: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017131148)

PAYMENT $1,456,875.00 RECEIPT #2017095244

10/10/2017: PAYMENT $1,456,875.00 RECEIPT #2017095244

NOTICE OF SALE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - KENNETH CZUBAY - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017041377)

4/4/2017: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - KENNETH CZUBAY - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017041377)

DEFAULT - ROBERTA K WALLRICH AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN P WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST - SYLVANIA LIGHTING SERVICES CORP AND KENNETH CZUBAY

3/30/2017: DEFAULT - ROBERTA K WALLRICH AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN P WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST - SYLVANIA LIGHTING SERVICES CORP AND KENNETH CZUBAY

SUMMONS SERVED - ROBERTA K. WALLRICH AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN P. WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST

2/17/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - ROBERTA K. WALLRICH AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN P. WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST

SUMMONS SERVED - CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS INC - SUBSITUTE SERVED

2/16/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS INC - SUBSITUTE SERVED

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - THE CITY OF NORTH PORT, FLORIDA- ISSUED 2/7/2017

2/7/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - THE CITY OF NORTH PORT, FLORIDA- ISSUED 2/7/2017

PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2017009988

1/31/2017: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2017009988

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/21/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MEMORANDUM OF FORECLOSURE SALE

8/4/2017: MEMORANDUM OF FORECLOSURE SALE

BIDDER REGISTRATION

8/4/2017: BIDDER REGISTRATION

PHONE CONVERSATION RECORD

8/2/2017: PHONE CONVERSATION RECORD

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS SERVED TO THE CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA

2/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS SERVED TO THE CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STEPHEN CUBBA, AS SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PETER J CUBBA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, U/A/D 3/5/99 - ISSUED 02/06/2017

2/6/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STEPHEN CUBBA, AS SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PETER J CUBBA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, U/A/D 3/5/99 - ISSUED 02/06/2017

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - UNKNOWN OWNER(S) AND TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - UNKNOWN OWNER(S) AND TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - ROBERTA K WALLRICH, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JILL K WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - ROBERTA K WALLRICH, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JILL K WALLRICH BENEFIT TRUST - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017011491)

1/27/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017011491)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT - REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - BIDDER REGISTRATION ACKNOWLEDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - AMENDED SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Nov 21 2017 9:30AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017131148)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - JILL CUBBA, AS SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PETER J CUBBA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, U/A/D 3/5/99 - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHARLOTTE GOLF PARTNERS INC - UNABLE TO ISSUE - MISSING FORM A, FORM B, AND CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSS CLAIM/COIUNTERCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$6,466,290.00; Amount Paid:$1,687,357.50; Waived Amount:$4,778,917.50; Amount Outstanding:$15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,905.00 RECEIPT #2017009469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ENTRY ONTO MORTGAGED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017011491)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CITY OF NORTH PORT, FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLAYTON, AMBER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORIARTY-SCHLICK, MARK C