This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/25/2023 at 18:20:56 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS DAVIS, JONNIE A Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against DAVIS, JONNIE A. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

Defendants

DAVIS, JONNIE A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONNIE A DAVIS

TOPPING, PETER E

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOPF, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2023018333

2/27/2023: PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2023018333

STATEMENT

2/24/2023: STATEMENT

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER

2/24/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER

NOTICE

2/24/2023: NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING

2/24/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

2/24/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

2/24/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

2/24/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

2/24/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONNIE A DAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - PETER E TOPPING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JONNIE A DAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2023018333

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $450.00; Amount Paid: $450.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PETER E TOPPING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONNIE A DAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JONNIE A DAVIS - ISSUED 3/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023031084)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less