This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 18:07:48 (UTC).

VINCENTDIGIORGIO, STEVEN VS EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 VINCENTDIGIORGIO, STEVEN filed an Other lawsuit against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VINCENTDIGIORGIO, STEVEN

Defendants

TRUIST BANK

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

TRANS UNION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELLINDER, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

7/25/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TRUIST BANK

7/25/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TRUIST BANK

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

7/25/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TRANS UNION LLC

7/25/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TRANS UNION LLC

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

7/25/2022: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022065706

7/25/2022: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022065706

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

8/4/2022: MOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

ORDER - GRANTING DEFENDANT TRUIST BANK'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

8/8/2022: ORDER - GRANTING DEFENDANT TRUIST BANK'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE - OF PENDING SETTLEMENT

8/12/2022: NOTICE - OF PENDING SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL

8/16/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING DEFENDANT TRUIST BANK'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $430.00; Amount Paid: $430.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - CTY >$15,000<=$30,000; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022065706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TRANS UNION LLC - ISSUED 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC - ISSUED 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TRUIST BANK - ISSUED 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELLINDER, THOMAS