This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/27/2022 at 16:18:52 (UTC).

VETERANS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT C/O DENNIS R NOVICKIS VS OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

Case Summary

On 06/19/2018 VETERANS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT C/O DENNIS R NOVICKIS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VETERANS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT C/O DENNIS R NOVICKIS

Defendant

OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

6/19/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

6/19/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2018062957

6/19/2018: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2018062957

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED - OSPREY ONE STOP ET AL

6/21/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED - OSPREY ONE STOP ET AL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - OSPREY ONE STOP, CO/ INGREM MCDUFFIE, UNKNOWN PERSONS

6/28/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - OSPREY ONE STOP, CO/ INGREM MCDUFFIE, UNKNOWN PERSONS

DEFAULT - OSPREY ONE STOP, CO/ INGREM MCDUFFIE

6/29/2018: DEFAULT - OSPREY ONE STOP, CO/ INGREM MCDUFFIE

ORDER SETTING HEARING

7/5/2018: ORDER SETTING HEARING

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/19/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MAIL RETURNED - OSPREY ONE STOP

7/25/2018: MAIL RETURNED - OSPREY ONE STOP

DOCKET USED IN ERROR- ENTERED IN ERROR

8/21/2019: DOCKET USED IN ERROR- ENTERED IN ERROR

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING

8/21/2019: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING

MAIL RETURNED - VETERANS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT C/C DENNIS R NOVICKIS

9/13/2019: MAIL RETURNED - VETERANS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT C/C DENNIS R NOVICKIS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

11/5/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019152933)

11/6/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019152933)

MAIL RETURNED - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

11/18/2019: MAIL RETURNED - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019152933)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • HearingTime: 10:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2B; Description: LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - VETERANS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT C/C DENNIS R NOVICKIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET USED IN ERROR- ENTERED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 11/05/2019 AT 10:45 AM IN 2B , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - OSPREY ONE STOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HearingTime: 03:00 PM; Location: COURTROOM 2B; Description: MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketACTION: UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT UNKNOWN PERSONS -NO PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - OSPREY ONE STOP, CO/ INGREM MCDUFFIE, UNKNOWN PERSONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED - OSPREY ONE STOP ET AL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2018062957

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - OSPREY ONE STOP C/O INGREM MCDUFFIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less