This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 04/23/2021 at 18:02:33 (UTC).

VENTURA, MARISTEL VS , RICK Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 VENTURA, MARISTEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against , RICK. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VENTURA, MARISTEL

Respondents

MYSLINSKI, RICHARD T

, RICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCHECKLIST INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5A; Description:DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (NORTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT - INJUNCTION - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021041095)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED - SERVED RICHARD MYSLINSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (NORTH COUNTY) DATE: Mar 9 2021 9:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketACTION: PACKET EMAILED TO SSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (NORTH COUNTY) DATE: Mar 9 2021 9:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION - SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - INFORMATION FOR RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE RELATIONSHIP FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICK is a litigant