This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 15:22:53 (UTC).

VENICE HMA LLC Et Al VS RUPERT, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 VENICE HMA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RUPERT, JESSICA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH

VENICE HMA LLC

Defendant

RUPERT, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - EMPLOYER NOTICE OF TERMINATION

3/11/2019: NOTICE - EMPLOYER NOTICE OF TERMINATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/5/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - JESSICA RUPERT

10/2/2018: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - JESSICA RUPERT

DEFAULT - JESSICA RUPERT

1/18/2018: DEFAULT - JESSICA RUPERT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JESSICA RUPERT

1/17/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JESSICA RUPERT

SUMMONS SERVED - JESSICA RUPERT

1/2/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - JESSICA RUPERT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017097897

10/18/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017097897

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JESSICA RUPERT - ISSUED 10/18/2017

10/18/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JESSICA RUPERT - ISSUED 10/18/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/18/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - TO DEFENDANT RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHEMENT

3/6/2019: NOTICE - TO DEFENDANT RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHEMENT

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (RECEIVED FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE)

2/5/2019: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (RECEIVED FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE)

ORDER - CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BOOKS-A-MILLION INC

2/5/2019: ORDER - CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BOOKS-A-MILLION INC

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

1/29/2019: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

SUBPOENA TO: JESSICA RUPERT

8/13/2018: SUBPOENA TO: JESSICA RUPERT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

3/20/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018035627)

3/20/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018035627)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

3/8/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT - OF ATTORNEY TIME SPENT

3/8/2018: AFFIDAVIT - OF ATTORNEY TIME SPENT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISSOLUTION OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - EMPLOYER NOTICE OF TERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - BOOKS A MILLION INC - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TO DEFENDANT RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED - CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT BOOKS A MILLION INC MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (RECEIVED FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST (RECEIVED FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BOOKS-A-MILLION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019010213

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JESSICA RUPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JESSICA RUPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JESSICA RUPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017097897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JESSICA RUPERT - ISSUED 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less