This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 08:31:48 (UTC).

VENICE HMA LLC Et Al VS BURGE, JACQUELINE

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 VENICE HMA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BURGE, JACQUELINE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH

VENICE HMA LLC

Defendant

BURGE, JACQUELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT - AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

10/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT - AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

ORDER - ON TELEPHONIC HEARING

7/25/2019: ORDER - ON TELEPHONIC HEARING

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/14/2018: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - JACQUELINE BURGE

11/15/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - JACQUELINE BURGE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018075377

7/24/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018075377

MOTION - EXTEND TIME TO OBTAIN SERVICE

6/29/2018: MOTION - EXTEND TIME TO OBTAIN SERVICE

SUMMONS NON SERVED - JACQUELINE BURGE

4/27/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - JACQUELINE BURGE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018025875

3/12/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018025875

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

3/12/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - SUMMARY - Recorded (OR. / 2019159087)

11/18/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - SUMMARY - Recorded (OR. / 2019159087)

MOTION - TO APPEAR BY PHONE - PLAINTIFF'S

7/23/2019: MOTION - TO APPEAR BY PHONE - PLAINTIFF'S

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/23/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

12/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/12/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE -TO SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT-JACQUELINE BURGE

9/12/2018: RESPONSE -TO SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT-JACQUELINE BURGE

ORDER - ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

7/16/2018: ORDER - ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JACQUELINE BURGE- ISSUED 03/12/2018

3/12/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JACQUELINE BURGE- ISSUED 03/12/2018

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/12/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - SUMMARY - Recorded (OR. / 2019159087)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OF ATTORNEY AS TO TIME SPENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • HearingTime:01:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMOTIONS SET FOR 09/04/2019 AT 1:00 PM IN H , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO APPEAR BY PHONE - PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018075377

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JACQUELINE BURGE - ISSUED 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTEND TIME TO OBTAIN SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - JACQUELINE BURGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$320.00; Amount Paid:$320.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018025875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JACQUELINE BURGE- ISSUED 03/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less