Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/22/2021 at 17:31:12 (UTC).

VENICE HMA LLC Et Al VS BAKER, HAYLIE R

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 VENICE HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKER, HAYLIE R. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH

VENICE HMA LLC

Defendant

BAKER, HAYLIE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - HAYLIE R BAKER

4/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - HAYLIE R BAKER

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021030584

4/8/2021: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021030584

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

4/8/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

4/8/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/8/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - HAYLIE R BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/12/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$360.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021030584

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R