This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/14/2020 at 15:09:22 (UTC).

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE INC VS COLE, JOAN I Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE INC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against COLE, JOAN I. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE INC

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287

COLE, JOAN I

COYNE, PATRICIA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMALBACH, HARRISON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

6/26/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

ORDER ON WRIT -TO ISSUE WRIT OF REPLEVIN

6/12/2017: ORDER ON WRIT -TO ISSUE WRIT OF REPLEVIN

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/23/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - JOAN I. COLE

4/21/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - JOAN I. COLE

SUMMONS SERVED - PATRICIA A. COYNE

4/21/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - PATRICIA A. COYNE

SUMMONS SERVED - THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATUTRES WAY NORTH PORT, FL 34287

4/21/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATUTRES WAY NORTH PORT, FL 34287

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287- ISSUED 3/31/2017

3/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287- ISSUED 3/31/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PATRICIA A COYNE - ISSUED 03/31/2017

3/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PATRICIA A COYNE - ISSUED 03/31/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOAN I COLE - ISSUED 03/31/2017

3/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOAN I COLE - ISSUED 03/31/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/31/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

3/8/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

PAYMENT $515.00 RECEIPT #2017021399

3/2/2017: PAYMENT $515.00 RECEIPT #2017021399

SUMMONS- PROPOSED-THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287-(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

3/2/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED-THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287-(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED-PATRICIA A COYNE-(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

3/2/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED-PATRICIA A COYNE-(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED-JOAN I COLE(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

3/2/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED-JOAN I COLE(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN - CIRCUIT (SOUTH COUNTY)

3/2/2017: COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN - CIRCUIT (SOUTH COUNTY)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED - POSSESSION - MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED - REPLEVIN - MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON WRIT -TO ISSUE WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:HEARING - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOAN I. COLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - PATRICIA A. COYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATUTRES WAY NORTH PORT, FL 34287

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287- ISSUED 3/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOAN I COLE - ISSUED 03/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: HEARING - CIVIL DATE: May 23 2017 10:30AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$545.00; Amount Paid:$515.00; Waived Amount:$30.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $515.00 RECEIPT #2017021399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED-THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF 208 NATURES WAY NORTH PORT FL 34287-(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED-PATRICIA A COYNE-(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED-JOAN I COLE(UNABLE TO ISSUE-NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN - CIRCUIT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less