This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/09/2021 at 17:01:00 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE FOR RMAC TRUST SERIES 2016 - CTT VS CRYSTAL SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE FOR RMAC TRUST SERIES 2016 - CTT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CRYSTAL SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE FOR RMAC TRUST SERIES 2016 - CTT

Defendants

MORGAN FLORIDA PROPERTIES, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED

MORGAN, TRACEY H

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

CRYSTAL SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SENKYR, KEITH

MORGAN, DAN

SIGNAL RESTORATION SERVICES

MORGAN, DANIEL P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASPER, KATHRYN

DIAZ, ADAM

Defendant Attorneys

GANDHI, SATYEN

GUARDADO, ASTRID

MEADOWS, CAROLYN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING

6/10/2019: ORDER - DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING

EXHIBIT - 21

5/1/2019: EXHIBIT - 21

NOTICE - SERVING ORDERS

4/3/2019: NOTICE - SERVING ORDERS

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

4/26/2018: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE - MOTION TO DISMISS

12/18/2017: RESPONSE - MOTION TO DISMISS

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

11/1/2017: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

10/24/2017: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DANIEL P MORGAN AKA DAN MORGAN - ISSUED 09/05/2017

9/1/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DANIEL P MORGAN AKA DAN MORGAN - ISSUED 09/05/2017

FORECLOSURE FORM B

9/1/2017: FORECLOSURE FORM B

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

1/17/2020: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

CERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

1/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

RECEIPT - OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE FROM EVIDENCE

1/10/2020: RECEIPT - OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE FROM EVIDENCE

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM CARRIE ORTIZ - PARALEGAL

1/9/2020: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM CARRIE ORTIZ - PARALEGAL

MOTION - TO RETRIEVE ORIGINAL COLLATERAL

11/6/2019: MOTION - TO RETRIEVE ORIGINAL COLLATERAL

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

7/26/2019: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

ORDER - AGREED - ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES

7/26/2019: ORDER - AGREED - ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - HEARING

6/27/2019: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - HEARING

MOTION - JUDICIAL NOTICE

4/24/2019: MOTION - JUDICIAL NOTICE

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 27 2020 9:00AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 27 2020 9:00AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE FROM EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM CARRIE ORTIZ - PARALEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AGREED GRANTING MOTION TO RETRIEVE ORIGINAL COLLATERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 27 2020 9:00AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 - ISSUED 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-MORGAN FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC - ISSUED 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-TRACEY H MORGAN - ISSUED 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DANIEL P MORGAN AKA DAN MORGAN - ISSUED 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017111367)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRYSTAL SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Signal Restoration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where MORGAN FLORIDA PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant