This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 18:32:54 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST VS LAUREN BOLES AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A SIMONS DECEASED Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LAUREN BOLES AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A SIMONS DECEASED. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST

Defendants

SIMONS, WILLIAM BENTON

LAUREN BOLES AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A SIMONS DECEASED

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARASOLER, TRACY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE- VALUE

11/22/2022: NOTICE- VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022182235)

11/22/2022: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022182235)

CERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

11/22/2022: CERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

11/22/2022: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LAUREN BOLES AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A SIMONS DECEASED - ISSUED 11/23/2022

11/22/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LAUREN BOLES AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A SIMONS DECEASED - ISSUED 11/23/2022

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS - ISSUED 11/23/2022

11/22/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS - ISSUED 11/23/2022

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS - ISSUED 11/23/2022

11/22/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS - ISSUED 11/23/2022

PAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2022104023

11/23/2022: PAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2022104023

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

11/29/2022: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE OF ORDERS

12/2/2022: CERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE OF ORDERS

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

12/13/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

SUMMONS SERVED - WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

12/13/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

DISPOSITION-FORM

12/14/2022: DISPOSITION-FORM

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022194002)

12/14/2022: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022194002)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022194002)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION-FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE OF ORDERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 03/21/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2022104023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $935.00; Amount Paid: $935.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99; Total Fee: $905.00; Amount Paid: $905.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS - ISSUED 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BENTON SIMONS - ISSUED 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LAUREN BOLES AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A SIMONS DECEASED - ISSUED 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022182235)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Starasoler, Tracy, ESQ.