This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 18:39:13 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ZELAYA, ROMMEL A

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZELAYA, ROMMEL A. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

ZELAYA, ROMMEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GETTLEMEN, CARLA REECE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006221

1/22/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006221

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-ROMMEL A ZELAYA - ISSUED - 1/22/2021

1/21/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-ROMMEL A ZELAYA - ISSUED - 1/22/2021

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/21/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-ROMMEL A ZELAYA - ISSUED - 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GETTLEMEN, CARLA REECE