Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 12:45:47 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST SERIES 2016 CTT VS DOYLE, JONATHAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST SERIES 2016 CTT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DOYLE, JONATHAN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST SERIES 2016 CTT

Defendants

DOYLE, JONATHAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN DOYLE

RIVEL, JESSE T

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JESSE T RIVEL

TENANT II UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT III UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT I UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT IV UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GASSEL, GARY

SCOTT, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

AKER, E

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE - ORDER SETTING CASE FOR RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE NONJURY TRIAL

5/1/2019: CERTIFICATE - ORDER SETTING CASE FOR RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE NONJURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING

11/14/2018: NOTICE OF FILING

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

12/1/2017: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

11/16/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

11/6/2017: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

6/14/2017: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5/15/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TENANT II/UNKNOWN TENANT- ISSUED 2/2/2017

2/2/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TENANT II/UNKNOWN TENANT- ISSUED 2/2/2017

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

1/31/2017: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - RETURNED CHECK

12/18/2019: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - RETURNED CHECK

BID SHEET

11/15/2019: BID SHEET

PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019108465

10/30/2019: PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019108465

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

10/14/2019: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

10/14/2019: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

10/14/2019: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

9/20/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

7/18/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTE AND MORTGAGE

7/18/2019: NOTE AND MORTGAGE

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - RETURNED CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR./ 2019162750)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019108465

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #2017010413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION REGARDING POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012874)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, JENNIFER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gassel, Gary I