This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 10:17:28 (UTC).

U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSORY BY MERGER TO LASALLE ANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES WMALT SERIE

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSORY BY MERGER TO LASALLE ANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES WMALT SERIE was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSORY BY MERGER TO LASALLE ANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES WMALT SERIE

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JULIETTE GETTLE AKA JULIETTE L GETTLE AKA JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SCOTT GETTLE A/K/A SCOTT J GETTLE AKA SCOTT JOHN GETTLE

HIDDEN OAKS ESTATES ASSOCIATION INC

SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC

GETTLE, SCOTT JOHN

GETTLE, SCOTT

JULIETTE GETTLE AKA JULIETTE L GETTLE AKA JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

GETTLE, SCOTT J

WILMINGTON FINANCE INC

JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KNOPF, ALLEGRA

HERNANDEZ, PETER

MCLAIN, ROBERT

FAGEN, JESSICA

Defendant Attorneys

BARBER, ELIZABETH

MCKILLOP, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/1/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER OF THE COURT

2/5/2019: ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER OF THE COURT

SUMMONS SERVED - N&M COOLING AND HEATING INC

1/10/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - N&M COOLING AND HEATING INC

NOTICE OF FILING - VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/13/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC - SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC - JULIETTE GETTLE AKA JULIETTE L GETTLE AKA JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

11/9/2018: DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC - SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC - JULIETTE GETTLE AKA JULIETTE L GETTLE AKA JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - N&M COOLING AND HEATING INC A/K/A N&M COOLING AND HEATING - NOT ISSUED - NO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED PER ORDER FILED 10/24/2018

11/9/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - N&M COOLING AND HEATING INC A/K/A N&M COOLING AND HEATING - NOT ISSUED - NO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED PER ORDER FILED 10/24/2018

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/16/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE - MOTION TO DISMISS

3/29/2018: RESPONSE - MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - FOR PLAINTIFF

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - FOR PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC - SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC AND JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

2/5/2020: DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC - SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC AND JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

2/4/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

ORDER - PROPOSED

12/20/2019: ORDER - PROPOSED

SUMMONS SERVED - AMY D. HOFFNER

12/12/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - AMY D. HOFFNER

NOTICE OF SERVING - ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/6/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING - ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - SCOTT GETTLE A/K/A SCOTT J. GETTLE A/K/A SCOTT JOHN GETTLE

11/26/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - SCOTT GETTLE A/K/A SCOTT J. GETTLE A/K/A SCOTT JOHN GETTLE

NOTICE - OF SERVING

8/30/2019: NOTICE - OF SERVING

STIPULATION - JOINT

8/21/2019: STIPULATION - JOINT

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/28/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

116 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC - SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC AND JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - WILMINGTON FINANCE INC, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - TO MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - CROSS NOTICE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - AMY D HOFFNER A/K/A AMY DIANE HOFFNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JULIETTE GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE L. GETTLE A/K/A JULIETTE LEE GETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SCOTT GETTLE AKA SCOTT J GETTLE AKA SCOTT JOHN GETTLE - ISSUED 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SCOTT GETTLE AKA SCOTT J GETTLE AKA SCOTT JOHN GETTLE - ISSUED 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING-CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO FLA STATUTE 702.015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017109644)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less