Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 20:50:03 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CSMC VS AVERBUCH REALTY CORP Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CSMC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AVERBUCH REALTY CORP. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CSMC

Defendants

MJBAT LLC AS TRUSTEE OF ELCAM 5052 REALTY TRUST UAD MAY 9, 2016

KRAVSHENKO, ANTON

JOSEPH PAOLOZZI AKA JOSEPH A PAOLOZZI

KRAVCHENKO, KSENYA

AVERBUJ, MANUEL

ELGAN ENGINEERING

OSTROVSKAYA, GALINA

DA SILVA, EDUARDO

THOMPSON, BRUCE

ZAVS-NEDVIZHIMOST, ZAO

YEREMCHUK, YELENA

CONCORDIA VENTURES LLC AS TRUSTEE OF CV MAGNOLIA

PENA, FERNANDO

YEREMCHUK, ALEKSANDR

OSTROVSKY, EVGENY

DA SILVA, BIANCA

PATRICIA PAOLOZZI AKA PATRICIA PAOLOZZI

AVERBUCH REALTY CORP

THE VILLAGES AT PINE TREE HOA INC

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANSWELL, WENDY

MCLEAN, OLEN

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, STEELE

HICKS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

4/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

SUMMONS NON SERVED - KSENYA KRAVCHENKO

3/28/2019: SUMMONS NON SERVED - KSENYA KRAVCHENKO

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/16/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF ACTION

1/14/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

1/10/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

12/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

MAIL RETURNED - ANTON & KSENYA KRAVCHENKO

9/25/2018: MAIL RETURNED - ANTON & KSENYA KRAVCHENKO

ANSWER - CONCORDIA VENTURES LLC AS TRUSTEE OF CV-MAGNOLIA TRUST UAD JANUARY 14, 2013

9/4/2018: ANSWER - CONCORDIA VENTURES LLC AS TRUSTEE OF CV-MAGNOLIA TRUST UAD JANUARY 14, 2013

RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT

3/19/2018: RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT

BID SHEET

1/31/2020: BID SHEET

PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020010687

1/31/2020: PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020010687

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

1/17/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

1/10/2020: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

10/7/2019: CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

LIST-TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

9/12/2019: LIST-TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

8/22/2019: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 5, 2019

7/31/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 5, 2019

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/22/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020023343)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020012596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020012595

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020010687

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE VILLAGES AT PINE TREE HOA INC - ISSUED 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUNTRUST BANK - ISSUED 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PATRICIA PAOLOZZI AKA PATRICIA PAOLOZZI - ISSUED 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSEPH PAOLOZZI AKA JOSEPH A PAOLOZZI - ISSUED 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CONCORDIA VENTURES LLC AS TRUSTEE OF CV MAGNOLIA TRUST UAD JANUARY 14, 2013 MANASOTA 718 FIDU LLC - ISSUED 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017022187)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE VILLAGES AT PINE TREE HOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Joseph A Paulucci and Patricia M Paulucci Trustees of the Paulucci Family Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant