This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/13/2021 at 23:44:47 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS WOODMERE AT JACARANDA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WOODMERE AT JACARANDA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

WOODMERE AT JACARANDA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANTWELL, MARY

Defendant Attorneys

SILVESTRI, PAUL

MILLER, CHANDRA LEE

MILLER, CHANDRA

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR. / 2019152267)

11/4/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR. / 2019152267)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/30/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/29/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

2/27/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/5/2018: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/27/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/1/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

4/20/2018: RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR. / 2019149963)

10/30/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR. / 2019149963)

NOTICE - OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

5/30/2019: NOTICE - OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

2/27/2019: MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/26/2019: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF SERVING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/5/2018: NOTICE OF SERVING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

4/16/2018: ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018012060

2/5/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018012060

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-WOODMERE AT JACARANDA CONDOINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

2/4/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-WOODMERE AT JACARANDA CONDOINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/4/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR. / 2019152267)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR. / 2019149963)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - JOINT - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 30 2019 2:00PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - LEAVE TO FILE AND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - WOODMERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018012060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-WOODMERE AT JACARANDA CONDOINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less