This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/12/2021 at 18:08:05 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, DEMI

Defendant Attorney

KOBY, SHAUN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

10/4/2021: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/22/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

9/15/2021: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

MOTION - INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

9/14/2021: MOTION - INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/14/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION, INC

9/7/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION, INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

9/2/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

8/18/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021069047

8/13/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021069047

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021069037

8/13/2021: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021069037

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

8/13/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

8/13/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 22 2021 9:00AM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 11/09/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - THE PLAYERS CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 09/14/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021069047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021069037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Koby, Shaun, ESQ.