This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 08:19:31 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

Case Summary

On 02/26/2014 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

WIEDER, SETH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/7/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/2/2016: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

7/7/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

DEFAULT - CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

5/21/2014: DEFAULT - CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

9/26/2014: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILTIARY SERVICE

5/20/2014: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILTIARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF COSTS

3/7/2018: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF COSTS

GARNISHMENT NOTICE

12/30/2014: GARNISHMENT NOTICE

MOTION - TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM

2/4/2015: MOTION - TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketREOPEN CLOSE PURSUANT TO ADMIN ORDER 2017-6.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • HearingTime:09:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 11 2018 9:45AM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • HearingTime:09:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILTIARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED NOTICE OF TENDER OF PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES A/K/A CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014023171

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CYNTHIA A RODRIGUES AKA CYNTHIA ANN RODRIGUES - ISSUED 4/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CYNTHIA D BANKS is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIEDER, SETH